SE Property Holdings, LLC v. Sandy Creek II, LLC et al

Plaintiff: SE Property Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Sandy Creek II, LLC, George W. Skipper, III, Lester Boihem, Carroll Castille, Coast Investment Properties, LLC, Nanni Pidikiti, Paul Peed, Raymond Peed and The Rookery, LLC
Case Number: 1:2012cv00303
Filed: May 3, 2012
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 23, 2014 152 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of SE Property Holdings, LLC against Sandy Creek II, LLC, George W. Skipper, III as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/23/2014. (cmj)
January 7, 2014 150 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting in part denying in part 143 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by SE Property Holdings, LLC. SEPHs Petition for Attorneys Fees and Costs is DENIED without prejudice as to Defendants Pidikiti and CIP and GRANTED in part and DENI ED in part as to Defendants SC II and Skipper, such that SEPH is awarded $230,465.50 in attorneys fees and $4,954.18 in costs and expenses from these Defendants; and to assist the Court in preparing a final judgment against SC II and S kipper, SEPH shall file, on or before Tuesday, January 14, 2014, a document including the amount of principal and interest, as set out. Defendants shall file any objection to said document on or before Tuesday, January 21, 2014. If no such objection is filed, the Court will treat the amounts claimed by SEPH as unopposed and will enter final judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/7/2014. (cmj)
November 6, 2013 142 Opinion or Order of the Court Order on Bench Trial - the Court finds in favor of SEPH andagainst Pidikiti and CIP on SEPHs claims for breach of guaranty contracts (as set forth in Count 2 of the Complaint), as set out in this Order. SEPH is to file documents to support its entit lement to and claim for costs and fees by 11/13/13. Any response to SEPH's petition for fees is to be filed by 11/20/13. The Court will enter final judgment specifying the amount of damages after a determination is made concerning the issue of attorneys' fees and costs.( Miscellaneous deadline set for 11/13/2013., Miscellaneous deadline set for 11/20/2013.). Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/5/2013. (cmj)
August 23, 2013 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 78 plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment against George W. Skipper III. The court will enter final judgment specifying the amount of damages after a determination is made concerning the issue of attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/23/2013. (srr)
June 21, 2013 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting SEPH's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 63) as toDefendants Sandy Creek II, LLC, Lester Boihem, Carroll Castille, the Rookery,LLC, Paul Peed, and Raymond Peed and denying Plaintiff SEPHs Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 63) as toDefendants Nanni Pidikiti and Coast Investment Properties, LLC.; denying 86 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 90 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 93 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/21/2013. (cmj)
January 30, 2013 71 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 57 Notice filed by George W. Skipper, III, which the Court construes as a motion to refer the claims relating to Skipper in this action to the bankruptcy court. It is ordered that the claims relating to Skipper in this action are REFERRED to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of Alabama (Case No. 12-3491-MAM) for appropriate disposition. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/29/2013. (Bankruptcy copied) (cmj)
October 31, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 52 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 39 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim filed by SE Property Holdings, LLC. Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Paul Peed and Rayond Peed's Counterclaim (Doc. 39)is denied in part and granted in part so that the counterclaim for declaratory judgment is not dismissed and the counterclaims for equitable estoppel and promissory estoppel are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/30/2012. (cmj)
October 10, 2012 51 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 50 Suggestion of Bankruptcy filed by George W. Skipper, III. All proceedings in this action against Defendant George W. Skipper, III, are STAYED pending further order of this Court. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/10/2012. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SE Property Holdings, LLC v. Sandy Creek II, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy Creek II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George W. Skipper, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lester Boihem
Represented By: Jonathan Corley Hill
Represented By: Robert Emmett Poundstone, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carroll Castille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coast Investment Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nanni Pidikiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Peed
Represented By: Sam David Knight
Represented By: Joseph Brannon Maner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Peed
Represented By: Sam David Knight
Represented By: Joseph Brannon Maner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Rookery, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SE Property Holdings, LLC
Represented By: P. Russel Myles
Represented By: Frederick George Helmsing, Jr.
Represented By: James S. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?