Duran v. Bay Inn & Suites, L.L.C. of Foley et al

Plaintiff: John Duran
Defendant: Lata Patel, Rick Patel, Sunny Patel and Bay Inn & Suites, L.L.C. of Foley
Case Number: 1:2012cv00310
Filed: May 10, 2012
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 11, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 46 Motion to Dismiss. The plaintiff's FLSA claims are dismissed with prejudice. His claim for breach of contract is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 3/11/2013. (tgw)
October 24, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 Motion to Set Aside Default. The Clerk's entry of default against Bay Inn is set aside. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/24/2012. (tgw)
June 19, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court Order striking the 6 Answer to Complaint filed by Rick Patel on behalf of Bay Inn & Suites, L.L.C. of Foley. The individual defendants are ordered by 7/3/2012 to file amended answers and/or motions as set out. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 6/19/2012. Copy mailed to Rick Patel, Lata Patel & Sunny Patel. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duran v. Bay Inn & Suites, L.L.C. of Foley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lata Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunny Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Inn & Suites, L.L.C. of Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Duran
Represented By: Banks C. Ladd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?