Allstate Indemnity Company v. Price et al

Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company
Defendant: Thomas Price, Marvalene Price and Jessica Peterson
Case Number: 1:2012cv00324
Filed: May 16, 2012
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 13, 2013 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 108 Motion to Enforce Settlement and Motion for additional time to consummate settlement documentation. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/13/2013. (tgw)
November 2, 2012 59 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 52 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Allstate Indemnity Company. Plaintiff is ordered by 11/9/2012 to file its fourth amended complaint. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 11/2/2012. (tgw)
October 15, 2012 47 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 45 & 46 Motions to Strike 36 Amended Complaint. The second amended complaint (doc. 36) is STRICKEN. Plaintiff is ordered to file a third amended complaint as set out by 10/19/2012. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/15/2012. (tgw)
August 30, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting in part denying in part the 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Marvalene Price, Jessica Peterson, Thomas Price. The 31 MOTION for Oral Argument filed by Jessica Peterson is denied. Plaintiff is ordered by 9/13/2012 to file a second amended complaint. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/30/2012. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Indemnity Company v. Price et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Mark E. Spear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Price
Represented By: Kyle Jordan Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvalene Price
Represented By: Kyle Jordan Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Peterson
Represented By: Kyle Jordan Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?