Johnson et al v. Champion

Plaintiff: Reginald Johnson and Shirley Johnson-Young
Defendant: Randall Champion
Case Number: 1:2012cv00334
Filed: May 21, 2012
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 28, 2014 161 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: all remaining issues relating to defendants' Motions for Sanctions (docs. 149 & 150 ). Plaintiffs are ordered to pay M.K. Harless and MKH Properties, LLC, the sum of $72,477.61 to offset attorney's costs and fees & Plaint iffs are enjoined from filing any Action against defendants. Should Plaintiffs wish to initiate a new Action within the scope of this injunction, they must file a proposed complaint in this civil action for pre-filing screening. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/28/2014. (tgw)
January 2, 2014 136 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 99 MOTION for Summary Judgment. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate City of Satsuma as a party defendant. Granting 104 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by MKH Properties, LLC, Maurice Kirk Harless. All claims and causes of action asserted against those defendants are dismissed with prejudice. Denying 97 MOTION "Leave for a Motion to Determine who among the Parties of this Litigation has the Superior Title to the Property". Granting [ 105] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by MKH Properties, LLC, Maurice Kirk Harless. The parties are ordered to attend and participate in good faith an in-person status conference to be scheduled by the Magistrate Judge. The Final Pretrial Conference, jury selection and trial settings are continued until further notice. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/2/2014. copies to parties. (sdb)
November 5, 2013 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 122 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 11/5/2013. Copy mailed to plaintiffs. (tgw)
October 23, 2013 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 113 Motion for this Court to Determine if the Parties to this Litigation excluding Officer Randal Champion, violated the below listed U.S.C. Codes and the Codes of Alabama. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/23/2013. Copy mailed to Plaintiffs. (tgw)
July 22, 2013 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice the 76 Motion to Determine Who Among the Parties of this Litigation has the Superior Title to the Property as Shown by Legal Evidence, This Property Being the Benchmark of this Litigation, and the Proximate Cause of the Constitutional Violations Imbued in the Original Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 7/22/2013. Copy mailed to Plaintiffs. (tgw)
February 5, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants "City of Satsuma Officials" and "City of Satsuma Roads/Zoning Employees" are dismissed, without prejudice to the plaintiffs' ability to seek leave to file a timely second amended complaint asserting claims against additional named defendants. The Satsuma Police Department is dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/5/2013. copies to parties. (sdb)
January 24, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 45 Motion For Federal Criminal Investigation. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/24/2013. Copy mailed to Plaintiffs. (tgw)
December 19, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court Order striking the 33 Response to Defendants' Answers filed by Shirley Johnson-Young, Reginald Johnson. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/19/2012. Copy mailed to Plaintiffs. (tgw)
August 6, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE. Plfs' attorney, John Baptist A. Sekumade, is ORDERED to file a proper pro hac vice motion and the supporting documents by 8/13/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 8/6/2012. (sdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. Champion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Johnson
Represented By: John Baptist A. Sekumade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Johnson-Young
Represented By: John Baptist A. Sekumade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Champion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?