Starnes Davis Florie, LLP v. GOS Operator LLC et al
Plaintiff: Starnes Davis Florie, LLP
Defendant: GOS Operator LLC, Gordon Oaks Healthcare Center, Gordon Oaks Memory Care Community, Gordon Oaks Specialty Care Assisted Living, GOA Operator LLC, GO ATM LLC, Mission Health of Georgia LLC, Bryan Crino and Scott Feuer
Case Number: 1:2012cv00387
Filed: June 8, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. The proposed Amended Complaint appended to the Motion is deemed to be the operative pleading in this case. The 5 Motion to Remand is granted and this action is remanded to the Circuit Court of Mobile County, Alabama. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/5/2012. (tgw)
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order re: 4 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint & 5 MOTION to Remand. Responses due by 8/13/2012, Replies due by 8/20/2012. The 6 MOTION for Leave to File Affidavits is moot. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 7/30/2012. (tgw)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order directing the defendant by 7/17/2012 to file a supplemental memorandum in support of the Notice of Removal re: jurisdiction. Plaintiff's response is due by 7/24/2012. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 7/3/2012. (tgw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starnes Davis Florie, LLP v. GOS Operator LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starnes Davis Florie, LLP
Represented By: Scott D. Stevens
Represented By: Jay Nicklos Robinson
Represented By: Michael Anthony Florie
Represented By: Walter W. Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOS Operator LLC
Represented By: Romaine S. Scott, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon Oaks Healthcare Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon Oaks Memory Care Community
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon Oaks Specialty Care Assisted Living
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOA Operator LLC
Represented By: Romaine S. Scott, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GO ATM LLC
Represented By: Romaine S. Scott, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mission Health of Georgia LLC
Represented By: Romaine S. Scott, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Crino
Represented By: Romaine S. Scott, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Feuer
Represented By: Romaine S. Scott, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?