Caffey v. Mobile Police Department et al

Plaintiff: Sonja Caffey
Defendant: Mobile Police Department and Chris Wilkerson
Case Number: 1:2012cv00400
Filed: June 15, 2012
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that judgment be entered in favor of the Defendant Chris Wilkerson and against Plaintiff Sonja Caffey. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/4/2013. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)
August 12, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Motion to Dismiss filed by Mobile Police Department. This dismissal with without prejudice to the plaintiff's ability to seek leave to amend her complaint to name a suable entity. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/12/2013. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)
November 5, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court declines to accept the 7 Report and Recommendation that this action be dismissed. The Court concludes that the complaint should be served on the defendants and that the Magistrate Judge should oversee this process. The 15 Motion to Appoint Counsel is denied. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 11/5/2012. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caffey v. Mobile Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonja Caffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobile Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Wilkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?