Garrett Investments, LLC v. SE Property Holdings, LLC

Plaintiff: Garrett Investments, LLC
Defendant: SE Property Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 1:2012cv00500
Filed: August 7, 2012
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2013 60 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of SE Property Holdings, LLC against Garrett Investments, LLC, John B. Foley, IV, Lauren M. Foley. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/8/2013. (cmj)
March 22, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Motion to Dismiss by Garrett; granting 31 Motion for Leave to File by SE Property; granting 19 Motion to Amend/Correct by SE Property; finding as moot 20 Motion to Amend Complaint by Garrett. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/21/2013. (cmj)
March 19, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 9 Motion to Remand to State Court as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/18/2013. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrett Investments, LLC v. SE Property Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SE Property Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Allen E. Graham
Represented By: Meaghan E. Hill
Represented By: Ashley E. Swink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garrett Investments, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Jackson
Represented By: C. Britton Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?