Coltin Electric, Inc. v. Continental Casualty Company

Plaintiff: Coltin Electric, Inc.
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company
Case Number: 1:2012cv00532
Filed: August 22, 2012
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 20, 2015 226 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 192 Motion to Strike ; denying 194 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 204 Application for award of attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/20/2015. (cmj)
January 16, 2015 218 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 195 Motion for Attorney Fees and the Commissioner is awarded attorney's fees in the amount of $110,124.13. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/15/2015. (cmj)
November 10, 2014 209 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 200 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, for reasons set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/7/2014. (cmj)
July 13, 2014 187 Opinion or Order of the Court Order entered [Doc. 135] Continental Casualty Company's motion for partial summary judgment as to the effect of the February 28, 2011 release is granted as set forth in the Order. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/13/2014. (khc)
June 25, 2014 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 135 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by defendant Continental Casualty Company, as set out; denying 147 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/25/2014. (cmj)
June 9, 2014 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 133 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/4/2014. copies to parties. (sdb)
March 28, 2014 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 116 Motion for Reconsideration of District Judge Order as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/28/2014. (cmj)
March 27, 2014 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 103 Motion to Amend Answer filed by Continental Casualty Company. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/27/2014. copies to parties. (sdb)
March 19, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 18 Motion to Intervene by Elkins Constructors, Inc., as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/19/2013. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coltin Electric, Inc. v. Continental Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coltin Electric, Inc.
Represented By: John Hardy Adams
Represented By: Andrea C. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?