Johnson et al v. State Farm

Plaintiff: Marvette Johnson and Debbie Johnson
Defendant: State Farm
Case Number: 1:2012cv00534
Filed: August 23, 2012
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court Order GRANTING 71 MOTION Pay Expert Witness Fees Incurred in Giving Deposition filed by State Farm; plaintiffs are ORDERED to pay State Farm $441.50 by 9/13/13. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/6/2013. (srr)
August 29, 2013 73 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 43 State Farm's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 58 Motion to Strike ; denying as moot 64 Motion to Strike. Plaintiff's claims are dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/29/2013. (srr)
July 26, 2013 65 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 64 MOTION to Strike filed by State Farm, no response to the motion to strike need to be filed and briefing is closed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/26/2013. (srr)
July 23, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 60 Motion for Leave to re-File excerpts of stricken document; State Farm shall file its reply in support of summary judgment by 7/26/13. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/22/2013. (srr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. State Farm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvette Johnson
Represented By: Ernest Eugene Warhurst, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Johnson
Represented By: Ernest Eugene Warhurst, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm
Represented By: James B. Newman
Represented By: Thomas Ryan Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?