Parker v. Encore Rehabilitation, Inc.

Plaintiff: Beverly Parker
Defendant: Encore Rehabilitation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv00539
Filed: August 24, 2012
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 15, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that the "Parties' Second Amended Joint Motion to Approve [the FLSA] Settlement" (Doc. 9 ) is GRANTED such that the parties' amended settlement agreement (Doc. 9-1), is APPROVED. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/15/2013. (sdb)
December 21, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 5 and 7 Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement with leave to file a revised settlement agreement and motion for approval of same no later than 1/11/13. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/21/2012. (cmj)
November 27, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 5 MOTION to Dismiss/Approve Settlement filed by Beverly Parker. ( Deadline set for 12/3/2012 for parties to supplement, attaching settlement agreement and setting forth facts of the case as set out.) Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/26/2012. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Encore Rehabilitation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Encore Rehabilitation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Parker
Represented By: Daniel A. Hannan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?