Lamar v. The Home Depot et al

Plaintiff: Eula M. Lamar
Defendant: The Home Depot and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2012cv00552
Filed: August 28, 2012
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 28, 2014 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 99 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 103 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 4/28/2014. (adk)
October 21, 2013 77 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting in part and denying in part 48 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Helmsman Management Services, LLC. The plaintiff's motion for leave to amend is granted. The plaintiff is given leave to file a second amended complaint by 11/21/2013. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/21/2013. copies to parties. (sdb)
December 3, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 10 Motion to Remand. The plaintiff's motion to remand is granted with respect to Count One and denied with respect to Counts Two, Three and Four. Count One is hereby REMANDED to the Circuit Court of Mobile County. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/3/2012. (sdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lamar v. The Home Depot et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eula M. Lamar
Represented By: Jay A. York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Home Depot
Represented By: Jason Matthew Langley
Represented By: Todd Neal Hamilton
Represented By: Jennifer W. Pickett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: J. Walton Jackson
Represented By: Daniel Trice Stabler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?