Woodyard v. Alabama Department of Corrections et al

Plaintiff: Draper Frank Woodyard
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections, Tony Patterson, Jesse Walter Bishop, Gwendolyn Givens, Ronzella Howard and David Leggett
Case Number: 1:2012cv00566
Filed: September 4, 2012
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2015 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 106 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/28/2015. (tgw)
May 18, 2015 97 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 86 Jury Demand filed by Draper Frank Woodyard. The plaintiff's Rule 39(b) motion for a jury trial is granted. The plaintiff's claim against the remaining defendant will be tried to a jury. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/18/2015. copies to parties. (sdb)
September 26, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The plaintiff shall have and recover nothing of the defendants Alabama Department of Corrections, Tony Patterson, Gwendolyn Givens, Jesse Walter Bishop and Ronzella Howard. Judgment is hereby entered in favor of defendants Alabama Department of Corrections, Tony Patterson, Gwendolyn Givens, Jesse Walter Bishop and Ronzella Howard and against plaintiff Draper Frank Woodyard. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/26/2014. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)
August 5, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING the 48 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. It is ordered that plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction (docs. 4 & 13) be and is hereby denied. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/5/2013. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)
June 10, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 39 MOTION to Compel filed by Draper Frank Woodyard. Defendants are ordered by 6/24/2013 to produce documents as set out. The 41 MOTION to Subpoena records re: the number of fights is granted unless defendants establish by 6/ 24/2013 that such records do not exist. Plaintiff is granted leave to Reply to defendants' Response (Doc. 37) by 7/8/2013. Plaintiff is ordered by 8/5/2013 to supplement his Rebuttal to Answer and Special Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 6/10/2013. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodyard v. Alabama Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Draper Frank Woodyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Walter Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwendolyn Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronzella Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Leggett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?