Hunt v. Patterson

Plaintiff: Gregory Hunt
Defendant: Tony Patterson
Case Number: 1:2012cv00752
Filed: December 18, 2012
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2015 78 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that this action be DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56(a). Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 11/5/2015. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)
September 29, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that Plaintiff's Motion to Reinstate the Department of Correction (Doc. 48) is DENIED as futile. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/29/2014. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)
August 4, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court Order affirming 44 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/4/2014. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunt v. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?