McCorvey v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Charles Elliott McCovery
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2012cv00757
Filed: December 19, 2012
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2014 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 67 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending 57 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Supporting Memorandum filed by United States of America be granted and that all claims against all defendants be dismissed with prejudice, as set out.. Copy to plaintiff by mail. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/11/2014. (adk)
September 9, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 67 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending 57 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Supporting Memorandum filed by United States of America be granted and that all claims against all defendants be dismissed with prejudice, as set out. Copy to Plaintiff by mail. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/9/2014. (adk)
December 12, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting the plf's 49 Motion to file Second Amended Complaint. The plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Doc. 49-1) is now the operative complaint in this matter. The following filings are MOOT: the government's 6 motion f or an extension of time to file responsive pleading; the plaintiff's 14 motion for an extension of time to file a response to the Court's April 22, 2013 Order; the government's original 18 motion to dismiss; the government's 27 motion to close the briefing schedule; and the plaintiff's responses to the government's original motion to dismiss (Docs. 43 , 44 and 46 ). The following filings are STRICKEN: the First Amended Complaint (Doc. 45 ); and the p laintiff's pro se motions, filed prior to the withdrawal of his attorney (Docs. 29 , 30 , 32 , 33 and 36 ). Responses to the 57 Motion to Dismiss due by 1/8/2014. Replies due by 1/22/2014. Motion to be taken under submission on 1/22/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 12/12/2013. copy mailed. (sdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCorvey v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Elliott McCovery
Represented By: Willie J. Huntley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?