Windham v. City of Fairhope et al
Plaintiff: |
Tina Diane Windham |
Defendant: |
City of Fairhope, Trent Scott, Damian Rehorn, Anita Kostyra, Bill Press and Frank Kostyra |
Case Number: |
1:2013cv00025 |
Filed: |
January 22, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama |
Office: |
Mobile Office |
County: |
Baldwin |
Presiding Judge: |
Katherine P. Nelson |
Presiding Judge: |
William H. Steele |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Other |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 23, 2014 |
Filing
102
ORDER granting 100 Motion to Retax Costs. Costs are re-taxed against the plaintiff and in favor of the defendants in the amount of $5,082.88. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 7/23/2014. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)
|
May 14, 2014 |
Filing
89
JUDGMENT: In accordance with the Order entered on this date, granting defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (doc. 76) and denying plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (doc. 71), it is ordered, adjudged and decreed that plaintiff have and take nothing, and that this action be, and the same hereby is, dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/14/2014. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)
|
May 14, 2013 |
Filing
29
Order re: 28 Answer to Complaint filed by Anita Kostyra, Frank Kostyra. Amended Answer or Show Cause Response due by 5/24/2013. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/14/2013. (sdb)
|
April 16, 2013 |
Filing
20
Order granting in part denying in part 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Trent Scott, Damian Rehorn, Bill Press, City of Fairhope & granting in part denying in part 12 Amended MOTION to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion for a m ore Definite Statement filed by Anita Kostyra, Frank Kostyra. The 14 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Tina Diane Windham is granted. All defendants are ordered to file answers to the complaint by 4/30/2013. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 4/16/2013. (tgw)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Windham v. City of Fairhope et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Tina Diane Windham |
Represented By: |
Ishmael Jaffree |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: City of Fairhope |
Represented By: |
David Kirby Howard, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Emily Coody Marks |
Represented By: |
C. Winston Sheehan, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Trent Scott |
Represented By: |
David Kirby Howard, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Emily Coody Marks |
Represented By: |
C. Winston Sheehan, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Damian Rehorn |
Represented By: |
David Kirby Howard, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Emily Coody Marks |
Represented By: |
C. Winston Sheehan, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Anita Kostyra |
Represented By: |
Thomas P. Ollinger, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Bill Press |
Represented By: |
David Kirby Howard, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Emily Coody Marks |
Represented By: |
C. Winston Sheehan, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Frank Kostyra |
Represented By: |
Thomas P. Ollinger, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?