Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company v. St. Catherine of Siena Parish et al

Plaintiff: Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: St. Catherine of Siena Parish and Kiker Corporation
Case Number: 1:2013cv00066
Filed: February 13, 2013
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 25, 2014 111 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company against Kiker Corporation, St. Catherine of Siena Parish with regard to Plaintiff's declaratory action, such that this matter is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/24/2014. (cmj)
March 18, 2014 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 69 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/18/2014. (adk)
July 30, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Penn National's 41 Partial Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Plead Fraud Claims with Particularity as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 7/30/2013. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company v. St. Catherine of Siena Parish et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Catherine of Siena Parish
Represented By: Peter S. Mackey
Represented By: Clay Thomas Rossi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiker Corporation
Represented By: Robert M. Galloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Steve R. Burford
Represented By: Lindsey Paige Hembree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?