Ely v. Mobile Housing Board
Plaintiff: Donavette Ely
Defendant: Mobile Housing Board
Case Number: 1:2013cv00105
Filed: March 1, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER denying 82 Motion to Alter Judgment; denying 84 Motion to Strike. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/9/2014. copies to parties. (sdb)
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting 63 Motion for Summary Judgment. This action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 4/7/2014. (tgw)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying 21 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Denying 22 Motion to Strike Affidavit and Motion to Find Plaintiff in Contempt. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/18/2013. copies to parties. (sdb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ely v. Mobile Housing Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobile Housing Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donavette Ely
Represented By: Kenneth James Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?