Mantiply v. Horne et al

Appellant: Mary Beth Mantiply
Appellee: Richard D. Horne and Patricia Nelson Horne
Trustee: Lynn Harwell Andrews
Case Number: 1:2013cv00258
Filed: May 8, 2013
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Butler
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2016 124 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 116 USCA Order. The Court grants the Hornes' motions and awards the Hornes appellate attorneys fees and costs in the amount of $92.495.86. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Butler, Jr on 9/28/2016. Copy to bankruptcy. (srd)
January 20, 2016 98 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. The Defendants/Appellees, Patricia Nelson Horne, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard D. Horne, and Patricia Nelson Horne, individually, recover of the Plaintiff/Appellant, Mary Beth Mantiply, additional appellate attorney's fees in the amount $14,918.60 dollars. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Butler, Jr on 1/19/2016. copies to parties. (sdb)
May 22, 2014 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 77 Motion for stay of execution of judgment. The supersedeas bond previously filed by the Appellant shall remain in the bankruptcy court during the pendency of the appeal. If during the pendency of the appeal Appellant seeks to sel l, convey, transfer, mortgage, assign, or otherwise encumber the real property to which the judgment lien has attached, she shall be required to file an additional supersedeas bond equal to 105% of the attorney's fee judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Butler, Jr on 5/22/2014. copies to parties. emailed USCA, Bankruptcy, Appeals Clerk, and Butler CRD. (sdb)
April 8, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 56 Motion for Disbursement of Funds. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Butler, Jr on 4/8/2014. (adk)
May 30, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 12 Motion to Set Aside. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Butler, Jr on 5/30/2013. (sdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mantiply v. Horne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Mary Beth Mantiply
Represented By: Mary Beth Mantiply
Represented By: Thomas R. McAlpine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Richard D. Horne
Represented By: Suzanne Paul
Represented By: C. Michael Smith
Represented By: Marion E. Wynne, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Patricia Nelson Horne
Represented By: Suzanne Paul
Represented By: C. Michael Smith
Represented By: Marion E. Wynne, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Lynn Harwell Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?