SE Property Holdings, LLC v. Braswell et al

Plaintiff: SE Property Holdings, LLC
Defendant: George S. Braswell and Vennie T. Braswell
Case Number: 1:2013cv00267
Filed: May 17, 2013
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Presiding Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 7, 2017 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 111 Motion to Exclude Expert Witness Testimony. Motions in Limine are due by 7/20/2017, with responses due by 7/27/2017. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 7/7/2017. (tgw)
June 7, 2017 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 98 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 99 Motion for Summary Judgment. As to Counts One & Four, this action remains set for Pretrial Conference on 7/25/2017. The parties are to submit their proposals regarding Counts Two & Three in their Joint Pretrial Document. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 6/7/2017. (tgw)
July 27, 2016 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 66 Motion for Leave to File Second AmendedComplaint. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 7/27/2016. (srd)
August 21, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Vennie T. Braswell, George S. Braswell. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint by 9/3/2013, failing which this file will be closed and judgment will be entered. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/21/2013. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SE Property Holdings, LLC v. Braswell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SE Property Holdings, LLC
Represented By: P. Russel Myles
Represented By: J. Blair Newman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George S. Braswell
Represented By: James G. Curenton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vennie T. Braswell
Represented By: James G. Curenton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?