United States of America v. Physicians Pain Specialists of Alabama, P.C. et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Physicians Pain Specialists of Alabama, P.C., Xiulu Ruan, John Patrick Couch, C & R Pharmacy, LLC and Castle Medical, LLC
Case Number: 1:2013cv00392
Filed: July 31, 2013
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 26, 2018 197 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting in part denying in part 184 MOTION to Dismiss. This action as to Castle is dismissed without prejudice to the relator's ability to seek leave by 7/26/2018 to file a fourth amended complaint, failing which this action as to Castle will be dismissed with prejudice without further notice. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 6/26/2018. (tgw)
May 9, 2018 193 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 182 Motion to Stay Discovery pending ruling on Castle's pending Rule 12(b)(6) motion to dismiss the third amended complaint. This stay of discovery shall dissolve without further court order the day following the date the Court enters an order completely disposing of Castle's motion (Doc. 184). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 5/9/18. (srr)
April 2, 2018 175 Opinion or Order of the Court Order denying the 158 MOTION to Alter, Amend or Vacate, construed as a motion to reconsider; granting 156 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. The judgment entered in favor of Castle is vacated. The relator's third amended complaint is due 4/9/2018. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 4/2/2018. (tgw) Modified on 4/3/2018 (tgw).
October 27, 2017 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 125 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. All claims asserted against Castle Medical, LLC are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 10/27/2017. (tgw)
September 22, 2017 143 Opinion or Order of the Court Order affirming Magistrate Judge's order (Doc. 139), as set out. Doc. 142 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Castle Medical, LLC is denied as moot. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 09/22/2017. (nah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Physicians Pain Specialists of Alabama, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Steven E. Butler
Represented By: Deidre L. Colson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physicians Pain Specialists of Alabama, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xiulu Ruan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Patrick Couch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C & R Pharmacy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castle Medical, LLC
Represented By: Blair Graffeo Mattei
Represented By: Christy Phillips Peek
Represented By: Richard D Sanders
Represented By: Michael E. Upchurch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?