WM Mobile Bay Environmental Center, Inc. v. The City of Mobile Solid Waste Authority
Plaintiff: WM Mobile Bay Environmental Center, Inc.
Defendant: The City of Mobile Solid Waste Authority
Case Number: 1:2013cv00434
Filed: August 23, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Presiding Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER denying 260 Motion for Equitable Relief. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 04/01/2020. (nah)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER denying 222 Motion for Writ of Replevin by WM Mobile Bay Environmental Center, Inc. as set out. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/24/2017. (srd)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 204 AMENDED JUDGMENT amending Amended Judgment (doc. 203) as follows: Judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff WM Mobile Bay Environmental Center, Inc. as to Count I, in the amount of $1,369,771.00 and as to Count III, in the amount $1,082,753.00. Except as amended herein, all provision of the judgment entered February 6, 2015 (doc. 173) shall remain in effect. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/17/2015. (cmj)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 202 Order re: 187 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by The City of Mobile Solid Waste Authority. The alternative motion for new trail as to damages claimed in Count X is DENIED.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/10/2015. (cmj)
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER denying 187 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, as set out, with the exception of the motions as to Count X, which remain under submission. A final amended judgment shall issue after 10/1/15. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/13/2015. (cmj)
March 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 177 Declaratory Judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff WM Mobile Bay Environmental Center, Inc. that it is entitled to an increased disposal rate in the current amount of $25.43. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/5/2015. (cmj)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 172 Order re: Plaintiff WM Mobile Bay Environmental Center, Inc.s oral motion to sever Count XI for declaratory judgment and The City of Mobile Solid Waste Authoritys oral motion for judgment as a matter of law as to Count XI. The oral motion to sever the current disposal rate portion of Count XI for determination by the Court is GRANTED, as set out. The oral motion for judgment as a matter of law is granted and denied as set out in order. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/6/2015. (cmj)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 74 Motion for Summary Judgment by WM Mobile Bay Environmental Center; granting in part and denying in part 75 Motion for Summary Judgment by The City of Mobile Solid Waste Authority, as set out in order. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/21/2014. (cmj)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER entered re; 12 Motion to Amend Complaint. Upon consideration, and for the reasons set forth herein, the motion is GRANTED and the first amended complaint shall be filed on or before December 6, 2013. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/27/2013. (mca)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WM Mobile Bay Environmental Center, Inc. v. The City of Mobile Solid Waste Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WM Mobile Bay Environmental Center, Inc.
Represented By: Jaime W. Betbeze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Mobile Solid Waste Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?