Hanson v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Anthony L. Hanson
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 1:2013cv00443
Filed: September 9, 2013
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 14, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER entered GRANTING without objection, 30 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's attorney, Byron A. Lassiter, be AWARDED a fee of $4,077.25 for his services before this Court, a nd that Lassiter pay to Plaintiff the sum of $3,585.41, the sum representing the fee previously awarded to Lassister pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, as further set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 10/14/2016. (clr)
October 28, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in accordance with the Order entered this date. It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that Judgment be entered in favor of Plaintiff Anthony L. Hanson against Defendant Carolyn W. Colvin. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff be AWARDED an EAJA attorney's fee in the amount of $3,58541. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 10/28/2014. (clr)
June 23, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in accordance with the Order entered this date. It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that JUDGMENT be entered in favor of Plaintiff Anthony L. Hanson and against Defendant Carolyn W. Colvin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 6/23/2014. (clr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanson v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony L. Hanson
Represented By: Byron A. Lassiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?