Rachel v. City of Mobile, Alabama et al

Plaintiff: Amy Rachel
Defendant: City of Mobile, Alabama and Michael T. Williams
Case Number: 1:2013cv00522
Filed: November 6, 2013
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 5, 2015 194 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 117 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by City of Mobile; granting 123 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Sergeant Ripple. All claims against Sergeant Ripple and the City are dismissed with prejudice. The 128 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Officer McCann & 133 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Officer Jackson are granted in part denied in part. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 6/5/2015. (tgw)
March 10, 2015 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 145 Motion to file an omnibus response, and the embedded motion to exceed the page limitations. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 3/10/2015. (tgw)
February 2, 2015 106 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 104 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Amy Rachel & City of Mobile. The City remains a party to Count One despite the stipulation. The 105 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Amy Rachel & Michael Williams is construed as a motion to dismiss Chief Williams. Responses due by 2/9/2015. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/2/2015. (tgw)
September 18, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 44 Motion to Dismiss; granting 46 Motion to Dismiss. Count Two is dismissed, and Counts One, Three and Four are limited as set out. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/18/2014. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rachel v. City of Mobile, Alabama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Rachel
Represented By: Drew Edgar Haskins, IV
Represented By: Erik Stephen Heninger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Mobile, Alabama
Represented By: Michael David Strasavich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael T. Williams
Represented By: Raymond Lloyd Bell, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan Brian Mabire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?