Young v. City Of Mobile et al

Plaintiff: Jerone Young
Defendant: Michael T. Williams, Samuel L. Jones, Sandy Stimpson and City Of Mobile
Case Number: 1:2013cv00586
Filed: November 27, 2013
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 29, 2014 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 85 Motion for Summary Judgment by Jones; granting 89 Motion for Summary Judgment by Williams; granting 93 Motion for Summary Judgment by City of Mobile; finding as moot 109 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/29/2014. (cmj)
August 7, 2014 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 63 Defendant City of Mobile's Motion for Summary Judgment as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/7/2014. (cmj)
June 17, 2014 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 46 City's Motion to Strike and judgment as a matter of law is entered as to Young's claims for punitive damages against the City of Mobile. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/17/2014. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. City Of Mobile et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael T. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel L. Jones
Represented By: Lawrence M. Wettermark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy Stimpson
Represented By: Gillian G. Watson Egan
Represented By: Kristin Taylor Parsons
Represented By: Ricardo Andrew Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Mobile
Represented By: Gillian G. Watson Egan
Represented By: Kristin Taylor Parsons
Represented By: Ricardo Andrew Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerone Young
Represented By: Carroll James Ogden(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?