SM Energy Company v. Smackco Operating, LLC et al

Plaintiff: SM Energy Company
Defendant: Katherine Owens, Robert C. McMillan, Elvira Tate Manley, ED Leigh McMillan, II, Thomas E. McMillan, Smackco Operating, LLC, Paul Owens and Roger Chapman
Case Number: 1:2013cv00594
Filed: December 5, 2013
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 26, 2014 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 122 Motion for Summary Judgment as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/26/2014. (cmj)
November 20, 2014 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 119 SM's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to the LLC's and the Ltd.'s affirmative defenses and all other issues regarding the alleged affirmative defenses are carried to trial. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/20/2014. (cmj)
May 29, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 44 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings as set out; granting 59 Motion to Amend Complaint as to the Ltd but denied as to McMillan Ltd as set out. SM Energy's amended complaint shall be filed by 6/5/14. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/29/2014. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SM Energy Company v. Smackco Operating, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Owens
Represented By: William P Maines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert C. McMillan
Represented By: William P Maines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elvira Tate Manley
Represented By: William P Maines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ED Leigh McMillan, II
Represented By: William P Maines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas E. McMillan
Represented By: William P Maines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smackco Operating, LLC
Represented By: William P Maines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Owens
Represented By: William P Maines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Chapman
Represented By: William P Maines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SM Energy Company
Represented By: Jeremy Richard Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?