Nettles et al v. Daphne Utilities

Plaintiff: Voneka Q. Nettles, Carlos Butler and Cedric Goodloe
Defendant: Daphne Utilities
Case Number: 1:2013cv00605
Filed: December 9, 2013
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 17, 2015 184 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of defendant, Daphne Utilities against plaintiff, Voneka Q. Nettles. The defendant is entitled to recover from the plaintiff its taxable costs. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/17/2015. copies to parties. (sdb)
July 27, 2015 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 168 Motion for New Trial and Motion for Sanctions; granting 169 Motion to Retax. Costs are retaxed against plaintiff and in favor of defendant, in the total amount of $2,444.80. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 7/27/2015. (tgw)
May 7, 2015 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 133 Motion in Limine; denying 134 Motion in Limine; denying 135 Motion in Limine; granting 136 Motion in Limine; granting 137 Motion in Limine; granting 138 Motion in Limine. The 129 Motion to Amend Pretrial Document is granted to include Defendant's Exhibits 44-49. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/7/2015. (tgw)
March 24, 2015 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 100 Motion to Amend Complaint entered as further set out. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 3/24/2015. (mbp)
August 5, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Motion to Strike Jury Demand. The jury demand by plaintiffs Nettles and Butler is stricken, and their claims will proceed to non-jury trial in the May 2015 civil term. Plaintiff Cedric Goodloe's jury demand remains in full force and effect, and those claims remain set for jury trial in the May 2015 civil term. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/5/2014. (tgw)
April 28, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion to Sever or Separate for Trial. It is ordered that each plaintiff's claims will be tried separately during the May 2015 civil term. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 4/28/2014. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nettles et al v. Daphne Utilities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Voneka Q. Nettles
Represented By: Ronnie L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Butler
Represented By: Ronnie L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedric Goodloe
Represented By: Ronnie L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daphne Utilities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?