McCulley et al v. Bank of America N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Linda K. McCulley and John H. McCulley
Defendant: James L. Permutt, Morris K. Sirote, Bank of America N.A., Andy Saag and Sirote & Permutt, P.C.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00620
Filed: December 17, 2013
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 20, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that this action is DISMISSED w/prejudice. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 5/20/2014. (copy mailed to Plfs on 5/20/14) (tot)
May 6, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court Order VACATING 34 Order & 35 Judgment as set out. Magistrate Judge Nelson is directed to amend her Recommendation to include the reference to footnote number two as set out, after which the court will consider the Report & Recommendation de novo. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 5/6/2014. (copy mailed to Plfs on 5/6/14) (tot)
April 21, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, this action is DISMISSED w/prejudice. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 4/21/2014. (copies mailed to Plfs on 4/21/14) (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCulley et al v. Bank of America N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L. Permutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris K. Sirote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America N.A.
Represented By: Jon Howard Patterson
Represented By: Gregory Berlin Pipes
Represented By: Brian Alexander Wahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Saag
Represented By: Jeffery J. Hartley
Represented By: Thomas Ryan Luna
Represented By: Samuel C. Rosten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sirote & Permutt, P.C.
Represented By: Jeffery J. Hartley
Represented By: Thomas Ryan Luna
Represented By: Samuel C. Rosten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda K. McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John H. McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?