PNC Bank, N.A. v. OM Properties, LLC et al

Plaintiff: PNC Bank, N.A.
Defendant: P.K. Garg Family, L.L.C., OM Properties, LLC and Purushottam Kumar Garg
Receiver: Metcalfe & Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013mc00009
Filed: June 25, 2013
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: Registration of Foreign Judgment

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 11, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part the 21 Motion for Approval of Private Sale of Assets Held by Receiver and for Order Related to Personal Property that is Not Receivership Property, as set out. Metcalfe & PNC Bank are ordered to notify the Court in writing after the closing has occured. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/11/2014. (tgw)
January 17, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting in part the 22 MOTION for leave to Seal Purchase Agreement. Metcalfe is ordered by 1/24/2014 to file a copy of the Agreement UNDER SEAL. The Clerk is directed to unseal the motion (Doc. 22). With respect to the 21 MOTION for Approval of Private Sale and for Order Related to Personal Property, the Court enters the following briefing schedule: Metcalfe's evidentiary submission is due by 1/24/2014, Defendants' objections due by 2/7/2014. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/17/2014. (tgw)
July 3, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 2 MOTION to Appoint Receiver filed by PNC Bank, N.A. Defendants are ordered by 7/10/2013 to file a statement indicating whether they consent to the appointment of a receiver. The 3 MOTION to Expedite Receivership Hearing is denied. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 7/3/2013. Copy sent to defendant's counsel via regular U.S. Mail and by email on 7/3/13. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PNC Bank, N.A. v. OM Properties, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.K. Garg Family, L.L.C.
Represented By: Daniel P. Saba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OM Properties, LLC
Represented By: Daniel P. Saba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purushottam Kumar Garg
Represented By: Daniel P. Saba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PNC Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Bess M. Parrish Creswell
Represented By: Jeffrey Uhlman Beaverstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Metcalfe & Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?