Smith et al v. Werner Enterprises, Inc.

Plaintiff: Cornelius Smith, Patrick Johnson, Willie Caves, Sr., Zachery Cleaves, Jamarcus Sampson, Rex Dailey, Anil Muzac, Laquinta Lawson, David Foster, William Newton and Thomas McIntyre
Defendant: Werner Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00107
Filed: March 10, 2014
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Washington
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15:1938
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 13, 2015 167 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 152 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 165 Motion for Leave to File sur-reply. The Court awards reasonable attorney's fees for Mr. Fuquay in the amount of $82,260.00 and for Mr.Keahey in the amount of $55,125.00. The Court awards costs of Mr. Fuquay inthe amount of $1,313.00 and of Mr. Keahey in the amount of $6,921.68. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 11/13/2015. (tgw)
October 19, 2015 160 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 154 MOTION for Leave to Supplement filed by plaintiffs. Plaintiffs are ordered by 10/20/2015 to file their supplemental material. Defendant's response is due by 10/21/2015. Plaintiffs are ordered to incorporate any reply into the reply brief previously authorized and due on 10/23/2015. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/19/2015. (tgw)
September 3, 2015 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 144 Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement. The parties are ordered to submit a proposed stipulated judgment by 9/17/2015. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/3/2015. (tgw)
July 27, 2015 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 123 Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement filed by William Newton & Werner Enterprises. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 7/27/2015. (tgw)
July 21, 2015 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 90 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 104 Motion to Strike. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 7/21/2015. (tgw)
July 20, 2015 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 93 Motion for Summary Judgment as to the MCA exemption. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 7/20/2015. (tgw)
November 21, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 9 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 11/21/2014. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. Werner Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornelius Smith
Represented By: Richard W. Fuquay
Represented By: George M. Keahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Johnson
Represented By: Richard W. Fuquay
Represented By: George M. Keahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Caves, Sr.
Represented By: Richard W. Fuquay
Represented By: George M. Keahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachery Cleaves
Represented By: Richard W. Fuquay
Represented By: George M. Keahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamarcus Sampson
Represented By: Richard W. Fuquay
Represented By: George M. Keahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rex Dailey
Represented By: Richard W. Fuquay
Represented By: George M. Keahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anil Muzac
Represented By: Richard W. Fuquay
Represented By: George M. Keahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laquinta Lawson
Represented By: Richard W. Fuquay
Represented By: George M. Keahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Foster
Represented By: Richard W. Fuquay
Represented By: George M. Keahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Newton
Represented By: Richard W. Fuquay
Represented By: George M. Keahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas McIntyre
Represented By: Richard W. Fuquay
Represented By: George M. Keahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Werner Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?