Sundance, LLC et al v. SE Property Holdings, LLC

Plaintiff: Sundance, LLC, Tammy Carter, Louis J. Principio, Paul L. Nabors and George S. Braswell
Defendant: SE Property Holdings, LLC
Counter_claimant: SE Property Holdings, LLC
Counter_defendant: George S. Braswell, Tammy Carter, Louis J. Principio and Sundance, LLC
Case Number: 1:2014cv00115
Filed: March 13, 2014
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Presiding Judge: William E. Cassady
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 8, 2015 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 80 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment. This matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a the scheduling of a settlement conference. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 6/8/2015. (tgw)
May 8, 2015 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 61 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/8/2015. (tgw)
February 19, 2015 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 67 Motion to Re-open Discovery. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/19/2015. (tgw)
December 16, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by defendant. Judgment shall be entered by separate order. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/16/2014. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sundance, LLC et al v. SE Property Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sundance, LLC
Represented By: Grant David Amey
Represented By: Bert P. Noojin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Carter
Represented By: Grant David Amey
Represented By: Bert P. Noojin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis J. Principio
Represented By: Grant David Amey
Represented By: Bert P. Noojin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul L. Nabors
Represented By: Bert P. Noojin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George S. Braswell
Represented By: Grant David Amey
Represented By: Bert P. Noojin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SE Property Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Ashley Swink Fincher
Represented By: Allen E. Graham
Represented By: Bradley Robert Sanders, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: SE Property Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Ashley Swink Fincher
Represented By: Allen E. Graham
Represented By: Bradley Robert Sanders, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: George S. Braswell
Represented By: Grant David Amey
Represented By: Bert P. Noojin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Tammy Carter
Represented By: Grant David Amey
Represented By: Bert P. Noojin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Louis J. Principio
Represented By: Grant David Amey
Represented By: Bert P. Noojin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Sundance, LLC
Represented By: Grant David Amey
Represented By: Bert P. Noojin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?