PNC Bank, National Association v. MWM, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: PNC Bank, National Association
Defendant: Ander J. Lee, Jr. and MWM, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00154
Filed: April 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: Bert W Milling
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2015 Filing 21 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of PNC Bank, National Association against MWM, Inc. in the amount of $113,068.37, as further set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/2/2015. Copy of this order mailed to the Defendant at its address of record. (sdb)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 PNC's Motion for Default Judgment as to Count Two. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/2/2015. Copy of this order mailed to the Defendant at its address of record, as directed. (sdb)
February 9, 2015 MOTIONS REFERRED: #19 MOTION for Default Judgment as to MWM, Inc., d/b/a Mattress World to Judge DuBose (cmj)
February 6, 2015 Filing 19 MOTION for Default Judgment as to MWM, Inc., d/b/a Mattress World by PNC Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Lon A. Keast, #2 Affidavit T. Julian Motes, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Nolen, Rodney)
February 3, 2015 Filing 18 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to MWM, Inc., d/b/a Mattress World (cmj)
January 30, 2015 Filing 17 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default against MWM, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Rodney E. Nolen) (Nolen, Rodney)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying #15 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/22/2015. copies to parties. (sdb)
October 10, 2014 MOTIONS REFERRED: #15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings referred to Judge DuBose. (sdb)
October 9, 2014 Filing 15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by PNC Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit T. Julian Motes) (Nolen, Rodney)
July 28, 2014 Filing 14 Clerk's Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant, Anders Lee, Jr. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i). No order will be forthcoming. See Matthews v. Gaither, 902 F.2d 877, 880 (11th Cir. 1990). (cmj)
July 18, 2014 Filing 13 NOTICE by PNC Bank, National Association Notice of Dismissal of Claims Asserted Against Defendant Ander J. Lee, Jr., a/k/a Ander Jackson Lee, Jr. (Motes, T.)
July 18, 2014 Filing 12 NOTICE by PNC Bank, National Association Confirmation of Service and Consent to Judgment w/Attachment (Motes, T.)
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order for Plaintiff to file a status report by 7/28/2014, to advise the Court as to the status of service of the summons of complaint upon MWM, Inc., and the status of the dismissal of the claims asserted against the deceased Ander J. Lee, Jr.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/14/2014. copies to parties. (sdb)
May 20, 2014 Filing 10 Summons Returned Unexecuted by PNC Bank, National Association as to MWM, Inc.. (Motes, T.)
May 20, 2014 Filing 9 Summons Returned Unexecuted by PNC Bank, National Association as to Ander J. Lee, Jr. (Motes, T.)
May 20, 2014 Filing 8 NOTICE by PNC Bank, National Association of Efforts on Service (Motes, T.)
April 7, 2014 Filing 7 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr: Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 filed by PNC Bank, National Association (Milling, Bert)
April 7, 2014 Filing 6 Document endorsed NOTED by Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 filed by PNC Bank, National Association. Review of the corporate disclosure statement pursuant to Local Rule 3.4 has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (khc)
April 4, 2014 Filing 5 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson and is now assigned to the docket of Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix KD-M after the case number on all future pleadings. (srr)
April 4, 2014 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ander J. Lee, Jr, MWM, Inc... Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
April 4, 2014 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by PNC Bank, National Association (Motes, T.)
April 3, 2014 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs PNC Bank, National Association, PNC Financial Services Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent PNC Financial Services Group, Inc. for PNC Bank, National Association.. (Motes, T.)
April 3, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-1564929, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by PNC Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Secretary of State, #2 Exhibit Note dated 7/19/02, #3 Exhibit Mortgage 7/19/02, #4 Exhibit Lee Guaranty 7/19/02, #5 Exhibit Note dated 7/29/03, #6 Exhibit Lee Guaranty 7/29/03, #7 Exhibit Note dated 8/19/04, #8 Exhibit Lee Guaranty 8/19/04, #9 Exhibit Note 8/16/05, #10 Exhibit Le Guaranty 8/16/05, #11 Exhibit Note dated 8/3/06, #12 Exhibit Forbearance Agr. 2/18/12, #13 Exhibit Demand letter) (Motes, T.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/3/2014: #14 Civil Cover Sheet) (adk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PNC Bank, National Association v. MWM, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ander J. Lee, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MWM, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PNC Bank, National Association
Represented By: T. Julian Motes
Represented By: Rodney E. Nolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?