Students for Life USA v. Waldrop et al

Plaintiff: Students for Life USA
Defendant: Tony G. Waldrop, John W. Smith, Michael A. Mitchell and John W. Steadman
Case Number: 1:2014cv00157
Filed: April 3, 2014
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 22, 2016 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 97 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 100 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment as set out in order. The parties are to confer regarding the wor ding of a judgment awarding declaratory and injunctive relief in accordance with this order and to file a proposed judgment (or, in the case of good-faith disagreement, separate proposed judgments), by 3/7/2016. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/22/2016. (cmj)
February 27, 2015 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 44 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/27/2015. (tgw)
February 4, 2015 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/4/2015. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Students for Life USA v. Waldrop et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Students for Life USA
Represented By: Travis Christopher Barham(Designation Retained)
Represented By: David A. Cortman(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Norman J. Gale, Jr.(Designation Retained)
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Kevin Hayden Theriot(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony G. Waldrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Steadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?