Breland et al v. Levada EF Five, LLC

Plaintiff: Charles K. Breland, Jr., Osprey Utah, LLC, Water Canyon Holdings, LLC, Range Creek Holdings, LLC and Utah Reverse Exchange, LLC
Defendant: Levada EF Five, LLC
Case Number: 1:2014cv00158
Filed: April 3, 2014
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 8, 2016 211 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Plfs' 198 Motion to Renew & 200 Motion for New Trial or, Alternatively, 200 Motion to Alter Judgment as set out, & Plfs' 199 Motion to Stay Execution is MOOT as set out. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 6/8/2016. (tot)
April 28, 2016 192 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Dft Levada EF Five, LLC against Plfs Osprey Utah, LLC, Range Creek Holdings, LLC, Utah Reverse Exchange, LLC, Water Canyon Holdings, LLC, Charles K. Breland, Jr., in the amount of $2,397,695.94. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 4/28/2016. (tot)
November 24, 2015 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Dft's 97 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 11/24/2015. (tot)
January 16, 2015 53 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 47 MOTION for W. Alexander Gray, Jr. to Withdraw as Attorney & 49 Certificate of Service. Motion is GRANTED. Levada EF Five, LLC is ORDERED TO OBTAIN COUNSEL to represent it in this action, & new counsel shall file a notice of appearance on or before 1/30/2015. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 1/16/2015. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Breland et al v. Levada EF Five, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles K. Breland, Jr.
Represented By: Robin Bryan Cheatham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osprey Utah, LLC
Represented By: Robin Bryan Cheatham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Water Canyon Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Robin Bryan Cheatham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Range Creek Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Robin Bryan Cheatham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Utah Reverse Exchange, LLC
Represented By: Robin Bryan Cheatham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Levada EF Five, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?