Claybar et al v. Huffman et al

Plaintiff: Warren Claybar, Rian Glasscock and Halley Moore
Defendant: Michael R. Huffman, Cindy M. Huffman, William B. Huffman and Huffman Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00205
Filed: May 5, 2014
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 14, 2016 77 Opinion or Order of the Court Order lifting the automatic stay as to Huffman Construction. Huffman Construction is ordered by 5/5/2016 to notify the Court of the substitute counsel it has retained. Supplemental Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/20/2016. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 4/14/2016. Copy mailed to Huffman Construction as directed. (tgw)
December 8, 2015 67 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Warren Claybar against Michael R. Huffman in the amount of $605,483.95; in favor of Rian Glasscock against Michael R. Huffman in the amount of 605,483.95; in favor of Halley Moore against Michael R. Huffman in the amount of $605,483.95. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/7/2015. (copy of order and default judgment mailed to Michael Huffman) (cmj)
October 23, 2015 64 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 60 Supplemental Motion for A. Clay Rankin, III & John L. Jernigan, III to Withdraw as Attorney for defendants. For Huffman's willful disobedience of court orders compelling his attendance at the PTC, the Court imposes the san ction of DEFAULT. Plaintiff's brief regarding damages is due by 11/12/2015. Huffman's response is due by 11/25/2015. Plaintiff is ordered to file a status report regarding Huffman Construction's bankruptcy proceedings by the 10th day of each month. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/23/2015. Copy mailed to Michael Huffman. (tgw)
September 19, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 15 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/19/2014. copies to parties. (sdb)
August 21, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 12 Motion to Consolidate. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/21/2014. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Claybar et al v. Huffman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Claybar
Represented By: Kasee Sparks Heisterhagen
Represented By: John P. Kavanagh, Jr.(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Brian McEwing(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rian Glasscock
Represented By: Kasee Sparks Heisterhagen
Represented By: John P. Kavanagh, Jr.(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Brian McEwing(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Halley Moore
Represented By: Kasee Sparks Heisterhagen
Represented By: John P. Kavanagh, Jr.(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Brian McEwing(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael R. Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy M. Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William B. Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huffman Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?