Shedd et al v. Barclays Capital Real Estate, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: George P. Shedd, Jr. and Pamela J. Shedd
Defendant: Barclays Capital Real Estate, Inc., Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc. and Monumont Street Funding II, LLC
Case Number: 1:2014cv00275
Filed: June 13, 2014
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
0 Judge: Charles R. Butler
1 Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:191
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2016 228 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 224 Motion to Amend and Certify Order for Interlocutory Review, or in the Alternative for Entry of Rule 54(b) Final Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/31/2016. (tgw)
June 13, 2016 220 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 176 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting 208 Motion for leave to file surreply. Counts Four (wantonness) and Sixteen (FDCPA violations) are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 6/13/2016. (tgw)
May 16, 2016 201 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 170 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims. Wells Fargo's counterclaim for breach of contract is dismissed. Monument's counterclaim for breach of contract is NOT dismissed. The counterclaim for unjust enrichment is dismissed in its entirety. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Butler, Jr on 5/16/2016. copies to parties. (sdb)
March 29, 2016 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 134 Motion to Compel Discovery, as further set out.; granting in part and denying in part 140 Motion to Compel, as further set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 3/28/2016. copies to parties. (sdb)
February 22, 2016 147 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 124 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Summary Statement of Facts and 3rd Amended and Supp Complaint filed by George P. Shedd, Jr., Pamela J. Shedd. Plaintiffs motion for leave to amend is GRANTED for the sole purpose of substituting "Wells Fargo Bank, N.A." as defendant in place of "Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc." Plaintiffs shall file a Third Amended Complaint and Summary Statement of Facts by 3/1/2016. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Butler, Jr on 2/22/2016. copies to parties. (sdb)
October 26, 2015 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 83 Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by Defendants Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc. and Monument Street Funding II, LLC, as further set out. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Butler, Jr on 10/26/2015. copies to parties. (sdb)
November 17, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER re: 31 Order on 20 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Butler, Jr on 11/17/2014. copies to parties. (sdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shedd et al v. Barclays Capital Real Estate, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George P. Shedd, Jr.
Represented By: James E. Robertson, Jr.(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela J. Shedd
Represented By: James E. Robertson, Jr.(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Real Estate, Inc.
Represented By: Griffin Lane Knight(Designation Retained)
Represented By: John Wesley Naramore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: D. Keith Andress
Represented By: Catherine Crosby Long
Represented By: W. Austin Mulherin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monumont Street Funding II, LLC
Represented By: D. Keith Andress
Represented By: Catherine Crosby Long
Represented By: W. Austin Mulherin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?