Zurich American Insurance Company v. Bulldog Marine, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Zurich American Insurance Company |
Defendant: |
Bulldog Marine, Inc., Bulldog Marine, LLC, Blacktip Partners, Inc., Blacktip Marine Partners, LLC, Brian L. Hall, Brenda R. Hall and Pedro E. Baez |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv00294 |
Filed: |
June 24, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama |
Office: |
Mobile Office |
County: |
Mobile |
Presiding Judge: |
Katherine P. Nelson |
Presiding Judge: |
William H. Steele |
Nature of Suit: |
Insurance |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 2, 2015 |
Filing
61
ORDER denying without prejudice 59 Motion for Default Judgment as to Defendants Bulldog Marine, Inc., Bulldog Marine, LLC, Blacktip Partners, Inc., Blacktip Marine Partners, LLC, Brian L. Hall, Brenda R. Hall. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/2/2015. Copy mailed to parties via regular mail. (tgw)
|
December 16, 2014 |
Filing
54
ORDER ADOPTING the 49 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Plaintiff's 41 MOTION for Entry of Default is GRANTED. The Answer (Doc. 10) is STRICKEN as to all defendants except Pedro Baez. The Clerk is directed to enter default against defendants Bulldog Marine, Inc.; Bulldog Marine, LLC; Blacktip Partners, Inc.; Blacktip Marine Partners, LLC; Brian Hall; and Brenda Hall. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/16/2014. (tgw)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Zurich American Insurance Company v. Bulldog Marine, Inc. et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Zurich American Insurance Company |
Represented By: |
Katie Margaret Kimbrell |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Bulldog Marine, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Jene William Owens, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Jessica Yvonne Pilgrim |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Bulldog Marine, LLC |
Represented By: |
Jene William Owens, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Jessica Yvonne Pilgrim |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Blacktip Partners, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Jene William Owens, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Jessica Yvonne Pilgrim |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Blacktip Marine Partners, LLC |
Represented By: |
Jene William Owens, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Jessica Yvonne Pilgrim |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Brian L. Hall |
Represented By: |
Jene William Owens, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Jessica Yvonne Pilgrim |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Brenda R. Hall |
Represented By: |
Jene William Owens, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Jessica Yvonne Pilgrim |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Pedro E. Baez |
Represented By: |
Jene William Owens, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Jessica Yvonne Pilgrim |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?