Carrier et al v. Navika Capital Group, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Teresa Carrier, Theresa Ford, Jamie Franklin, Patricia Hannon, Cynthia Knight, Linda Law, April McGee, Aundrea Poellnitz, Jauran Portis, Lakita Reed, Markeisha Stokes, Carolyn White, Melissa Wilkins and Robbie Williams
Defendant: Navika Capital Group, LLC, Silverstone Hospitality, Inc. and Naveen C. Shah
Case Number: 1:2014cv00311
Filed: July 8, 2014
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 9, 2017 90 Opinion or Order of the Court Order denying 86 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Lakita Reed, Aundrea Poellnitz, Jamie Franklin, Linda Law, Robbie Williams, Cynthia Knight, Theresa Ford with leave to file a new motion by 2/23/17 as set out. Defendants shall file any response by 3/2/17. ( Miscellaneous deadline set for 2/23/2017; Miscellaneous deadline set for 3/2/2017.) Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/9/2017. (cmj)
March 17, 2016 70 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered that the Defendants Amended Motion to DismissPlaintiffs Amended Complaint and Supporting Memorandum of Law (the AmendedMotion to Dismiss) (Doc. 36) be (a) GRANTED to the extent that the following claimsare dismissed under FED R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6): all of Jauran Portis claims; any of AundreaPoellnitzs claims that accrued prior to August 2, 2009; any of Theresa Fords claims thataccrued prior to June 30, 2009; any of Linda Laws claims that accrued prior to July 13,2009; any of Lakitha Reeds claims that accrued prior to July 10, 2009; and any of RobbieWilliams claims that accrued prior to July 12, 2009; and (b) DENIED in all otheraspects.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/17/2016. (cmj)
July 1, 2015 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 45 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 21 Amended Complaint, filed by Jauran Portis, Teresa Carrier, Lakita Reed, Melissa Wilkins, Carolyn White, Theresa Ford, Patricia Hannon, Aundrea Poellnitz, Jamie Franklin, Linda Law, Robbie Williams, Cynthia Knight, April McGee that plaintiffs Teresa Carrier, Patricia Hannon and April McGee are dismissed without prejudice due to their failure to prosecute and failure to obey this Court's orders.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/26/15. (cmj)
May 5, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 25 Motion for Reconsideration of District Judge Order as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/5/2015. (cmj)
March 12, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 16 Motion to Dismiss in light of the amended complaint and removal of plaintiff Markeisha Stokes. Markeisha Stokes' Notice of Dismissal (doc. 20) is moot.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/12/2015. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carrier et al v. Navika Capital Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Carrier
Represented By: Howard L. Steele, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Ford
Represented By: Howard L. Steele, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Franklin
Represented By: Howard L. Steele, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Hannon
Represented By: Howard L. Steele, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Knight
Represented By: Howard L. Steele, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Law
Represented By: Howard L. Steele, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April McGee
Represented By: Howard L. Steele, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aundrea Poellnitz
Represented By: Howard L. Steele, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jauran Portis
Represented By: Howard L. Steele, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakita Reed
Represented By: Howard L. Steele, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markeisha Stokes
Represented By: Howard L. Steele, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn White
Represented By: Howard L. Steele, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Wilkins
Represented By: Howard L. Steele, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robbie Williams
Represented By: Howard L. Steele, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navika Capital Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silverstone Hospitality, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naveen C. Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?