Gacek v. Premier Medical Management Inc.
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Premier Medical Management Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00342
Filed: July 23, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 159 Order GRANTING Dft's 158 Consent MOTION to Alter or Amend. The Court's 157 Order is AMENDED to reflect that the claims brought by Plf Gacek, individually & as Relator on behalf of the United States, are dismissed w/prejudice, & the United States is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 2/14/19. (tot)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER re: 155 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. This case is DISMISSED W/PREJUDICE as to Mark R. Gacek's individual claims w/the parties to bear their own attnys' fees & costs. The case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to those claims brought by Gacek on behalf of the United States. Clerk is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 1/28/19. (tot)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Order re: 71 MOTION to Unseal the Original Complaint filed by Premier Medical Management Inc. Gacek & the Government are ordered to show cause why the motion should not be granted by 10/31/2017. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 10/24/2017. (tgw)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Order granting in part denying in part the 31 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Answer due from Premier Medical Management Inc. on 7/14/2017. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 6/30/2017. (tgw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gacek v. Premier Medical Management Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Medical Management Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Conor Finnegan
Represented By: Philip Daniel Mahoney
Represented By: James B. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Deidre L. Colson(Designation Assistant U.S. Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?