Campbell v. Lightner et al
Plaintiff: Douglas Campbell
Defendant: Warden Lightner, Blake Lambert and David Gibson
Case Number: 1:2014cv00344
Filed: July 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 JUDGMENT in favor of Dfts Blake Lambert, David Gibson & against Plf Douglas Campbell. This action is DISMISSED w/prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/7/2017. (copy mailed to Plf on 8/7/17) (tot)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Order DENYING 41 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and GRANTING 44 MOTION for Extension of Time. Plaintiff is directed to file any materials in opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment no later than 1/27/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 1/6/2017. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (srd)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 JUDGMENT that Plf's claim against Dft Lightner is DISMISSED w/prejudice, prior to service, because the claim against him is frivolous as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 1/13/2016. (copy mailed to Plf on 1/14/16) (tot)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. Lightner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Lightner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?