Betts v. Conecuh County Board of Education

Plaintiff: Terra Betts
Defendant: Conecuh County Board of Education, Ronnie Brogden and Mary Ann Danford
Case Number: 1:2014cv00356
Filed: July 30, 2014
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Monroe
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 3, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 52 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. All claims in this action are DISMISSED W/PREJUDICE as set out. Each party shall bear his, her or its own respective costs. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 5/3/2016. (tot)
June 15, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 33 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Dfts' 29 Partial MOTION to Dismiss is GRANTED, & Count IV of the 28 Second Amended Complaint is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 6/15/2015. (tot)
March 30, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 24 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Dfts' 20 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint is DENIED; Betts' 19 Amended Complaint is STRICKEN, & Betts is ORDERED to file an amended complaint in accordance w/the instructions set out in the Court's 12/30/14 17 Order NLT 4/6/2015. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 3/30/2015. (tot)
December 30, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as the opinion of this Court; GRANTING in part and DENYING in part Defendants' 7 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively for More Definite Statement; DISMISSING claims as set forth in Order, GRANTING motion for more definite statement, and directing plaintiff to file an amended complaint as set forth in order not later than 1/12/2015. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/30/2014. (mab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Betts v. Conecuh County Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terra Betts
Represented By: Amardo Wesley Pitters(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conecuh County Board of Education
Represented By: Joseph Seawell Moore(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Dorman Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Brogden
Represented By: Joseph Seawell Moore(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Dorman Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Ann Danford
Represented By: Joseph Seawell Moore(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Dorman Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?