Utah Reverse Exchange, LLC et al v. Donado et al

Plaintiff: Utah Reverse Exchange, LLC, Range Creek Holdings, LLC, Water Canyon Holdings, LLC, Patmos Energy, LLC and Florencia Development, LLC
Defendant: Linda Donado and William Donado
Case Number: 1:2014cv00408
Filed: September 2, 2014
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Presiding Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 4, 2016 126 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting in part denying in part the 108 MOTION for Partial Findings filed by Plaintiffs. The parties are ordered file their proposed final judgment by 11/18/2016. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 11/4/2016. (tgw)
February 12, 2016 103 Opinion or Order of the Court Order: The Court concludes that the plaintiffs' res judicata defense is legally insupportable. Plaintiffs are forbidden to assert this defense before the jury. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/12/2016. (tgw)
January 28, 2016 97 Opinion or Order of the Court Order that trial will commence with the parties' opening statements regarding the Mexico property, followed by the presentation of evidence to the jury, closing arguments and jury instructions. Trial will then resume as to the Utah property, with the parties presenting to the Court only evidence not already presented to the jury. The Court elects to permit the defendants to present their case first. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/28/2016. (tgw)
December 2, 2015 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 61 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/2/2015. (tgw)
February 2, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 13 Motion to Strike ; denying 15 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/2/2015. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Utah Reverse Exchange, LLC et al v. Donado et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Utah Reverse Exchange, LLC
Represented By: Steven Anthony Higgins(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Kenneth A. Hitson, Jr.(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Range Creek Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Steven Anthony Higgins(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Kenneth A. Hitson, Jr.(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Water Canyon Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Steven Anthony Higgins(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Kenneth A. Hitson, Jr.(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patmos Energy, LLC
Represented By: Steven Anthony Higgins(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Kenneth A. Hitson, Jr.(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florencia Development, LLC
Represented By: Steven Anthony Higgins(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Kenneth A. Hitson, Jr.(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Donado
Represented By: Steven G. Durio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Donado
Represented By: Steven G. Durio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?