Strawser v. State of Alabama Featured Case

Plaintiff: James N. Strawser and John E. Humphrey
Defendant: State of Alabama
Case Number: 1:2014cv00424
Filed: September 11, 2014
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2016 194 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING in part & DENYING in part Plfs' 191 Motion to Re-tax Costs. Plfs are awarded costs in the amount of $943.00 as set out. The motion is DENIED to the extent they sought to recover the costs of postage. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/23/2016. (tot)
August 22, 2016 193 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of the named Plfs & Plf Class members. ALA. CONST. art. I, § 36.03 (2006) & ALA. CODE 1975 § 30-1-19 are unconstitutional as set out. The Attorney General for the State of Alabama, Judge Don Davis, Judge Tim Russell & the members of the Dft Class are ENJOINED from enforcing Alabama laws that prohibit or fail to recognize same-sex marriage as set out. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/22/2016. (tot)
June 7, 2016 180 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that Judge Don Davis, Judge Tim Russell & the members of the Dft Class are ENJOINED from enforcing Alabama laws that prohibit or fail to recognize same-sex marriage as set out. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 6/7/2016. (tot)
May 21, 2015 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, DENYING the 114 motion of Judge Tim Russell to alter, amend or vacate. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 5/21/2015. (mab)
April 23, 2015 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 101 Motion to Dismiss filed by Dft Luther Strange as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 4/24/2015. (tot)
March 18, 2015 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 76 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 3/18/2015. copies to parties. (sdb)
March 16, 2015 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Judge Don Davis' 71 Motion to Stay Court's 2/12/15 Preliminary Injunction Order as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 3/16/2015. (tot)
February 20, 2015 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Plfs' 60 Emergency Motion for Enforcement of Judgment as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 2/20/2015. (tot)
February 12, 2015 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, It is ORDERED and DECLARED that ALA. CONST. ART. I, § 36.03 (2006) and ALA. CODE 1975 § 30-1-19 are unconstitutional because they violate the Due Process Clause and the Equal Protection Clause of the Fourteenth Amendment. Probate Judge Don Davis is hereby ENJOINED from refusing to issue marriage licenses to plaintiffs due to the Alabama laws which prohibit same-sex marriage. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 2/12/2015. (mab)
February 10, 2015 46 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: Plfs' 43 Emergency MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction &/or Temporary Restraining Order. Plfs' 43 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint is GRANTED as set out. A Hearing o n the 43 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction is set for 2/12/2015 at 01:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2B, 113 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Judge Callie V. S. Granade. The clerk of court is directed to provide Joseph Michael Druhan, Jr., counsel for Judge Don Davis, with a copy of this Order. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 2/10/2015. (tot)
January 26, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Plfs' 15 Motion for Preliminary Injunction & Permanent Injunction. Court ORDERS that the Alabama Attny Gen is prohibited from enforcing the Alabama laws which prohibit same-sex marriage as set out. Court STAYS execution of this in junction for 14 days to allow Dft to seek a further stay pending appeal in the Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeals. If no action by the Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeals to extend or lift the stay with that time period, this stay will be lifted on 2/9/15. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 1/26/2015. (copies mailed to Plfs on 1/26/15) (tot)
December 11, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Plf's 12 MOTION to Amend 1 Complaint is GRANTED as set out. 8 MOTION to Dismiss is MOOT as set out. Luther Strange, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the State of Alabama, is substituted in place of the State of Alabama as the party dft. Dft Luther Strange is to file his answer NLT 12/18/2014. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/11/2014. (copy mailed to Plfs on 12/11/14) (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strawser v. State of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James N. Strawser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John E. Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?