PNC Bank, N.A. v. Presbyterian Retirement Corporation, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: PNC Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Presbyterian Retirement Corporation, Inc., The Special Care Facilities Authority of the City of Daphne and Infirmary Health System, Inc.
Counter_claimant: Infirmary Health System, Inc. and Presbyterian Retirement Corporation, Inc.
Counter_defendant: PNC Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00461
Filed: October 2, 2014
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 28, 2015 68 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting in part denying in part 56 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. This case is STAYED pending arbitration. PNC is ordered to file a Status Report by 5/26/2015 and on or before the 4th Tuesday of each month.The 65 MOTION to Stay Deadlines is moot. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 4/28/2015. (tgw)
November 13, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 3 Motion to Appoint Receiver. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 11/13/2014. (tgw)
November 4, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Motion to Intervene. The Clerk is directed to add Infirmary Health System, Inc. as a party Defendant. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 11/4/2014. (tgw)
October 7, 2014 9 Opinion or Order of the Court Order denying 5 MOTION to Expedite Hearing of Motion for Appointment of Receiver filed by PNC Bank, N.A. Response to Motion due by 10/21/2014, Replies due by 10/28/2014. Plaintiff is ordered to deliver this Order to defendant's counsel by 10/9/2014 & file a notice of compliance. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/7/2014. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PNC Bank, N.A. v. Presbyterian Retirement Corporation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PNC Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Michael Leo Hall
Represented By: Heather Ann Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Presbyterian Retirement Corporation, Inc.
Represented By: Stewart M. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Special Care Facilities Authority of the City of Daphne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infirmary Health System, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy Lowery Retherford
Represented By: Alan T. Rogers
Represented By: William Clark Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Infirmary Health System, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy Lowery Retherford
Represented By: Alan T. Rogers
Represented By: William Clark Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Presbyterian Retirement Corporation, Inc.
Represented By: Stewart M. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: PNC Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Michael Leo Hall
Represented By: Heather Ann Lee
Represented By: Michael Leo Hall
Represented By: Heather Ann Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?