Cordova et al v. R&A Oysters, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Miguel Angel Fuentes Cordova and Leobardo Morales Inclan
Defendant: R&A Oysters, Inc., Rodney L. Fox and Ann P. Fox
Case Number: 1:2014cv00462
Filed: October 8, 2014
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2016 188 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Of Final Approval Of Class Action Settlement Agreement And Entry Of Final Judgment, as set out. This action is dismissed with prejudice subject to the terms of the settlement agreement. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/6/2016. (tgw)
September 12, 2016 176 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 173 Joint MOTION to Approve Settlement Agreement. Fairness Hearing set for 12/6/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2A. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/12/2016. (tgw)
June 2, 2016 164 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 145 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court filed by Miguel Angel Fuentes Cordova, Leobardo Morales Inclan. The Magistrate Judge decision is AFFIRMED. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 6/2/2016. (tgw)
May 9, 2016 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 122 Motion for Attorney Fees and granting their 139 supplemental motion for attorney's fees. The Court awards reasonable attorney's fees in the amount of $64,177.88 and costs in the amount of $762.50. To the extent the plaintiffs seek additional recovery, their motion for attorney's fees and costs is denied. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/9/2016. (mbp)
March 8, 2016 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 95 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 3/8/2016. (tgw)
March 1, 2016 117 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 112 Unopposed MOTION Approval of Acceptance of Amended Rule 68 Offer of Judgment and Entry of Final Judgment. The settlement is approved. The parties are to submit a proposed stipulated judgment by 3/15/2016. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 3/1/2016. (tgw)
December 21, 2015 102 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 101 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment filed by Miguel Angel Fuentes Cordova, Leobardo Morales Inclan. The Notice, construed as a motion, is denied without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/21/2015. (tgw)
July 27, 2015 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part the 69 Motion for Protective Order, with deadlines as set out. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 7/27/2015. (tgw)
April 29, 2015 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered that Doc. 31 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED with respect to Counts II, IV and VI, and DENIED with respect to Count III. Counts II, IV and VI are dismissed, as further set out. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 4/29/2015. (jlr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cordova et al v. R&A Oysters, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Angel Fuentes Cordova
Represented By: Samuel Jacob Brooke
Represented By: Eunice Cho
Represented By: James Melvin Knoepp
Represented By: Meredith Blake Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leobardo Morales Inclan
Represented By: Samuel Jacob Brooke
Represented By: Eunice Cho
Represented By: James Melvin Knoepp
Represented By: Meredith Blake Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R&A Oysters, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney L. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann P. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?