Price v. Thomas et al

Plaintiff: Christopher Lee Price
Defendant: Kim Thomas, Walter Myers and Alabama Department of Corrections
Case Number: 1:2014cv00472
Filed: October 8, 2014
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Escambia
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 10, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 39 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS denying 35 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/10/2015. (cmj)
July 23, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion to Amend Complaint as set out. Plaintiff is to file an amended complaint by 8/6/15 in compliance with order. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/23/2015. (cmj)
March 23, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING IN PART 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 10 MOTION to Dismiss (Defendants' Motion to Dismiss) filed by Walter Myers, Kim Thomas, Alabama Department of Corrections. The Court adopts Part A, B, and D. The Court will withhold ruling for 30 days on the current motion to dismiss to allow the Plaintiff to file a motion to amend the complaint, as set out. If the amended complaint is allowed, the previously filed motion to dismiss based on failure to state a claim will be determined to be moot. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/23/2015. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price v. Thomas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Lee Price
Represented By: Aaron M. Katz(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?