Alsip v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al

Plaintiff: Emma Alsip
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Case Number: 1:2014cv00476
Filed: October 14, 2014
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2016 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Dft's 122 Motion to Retax in the amount of $6,859.99 as set out & DENYING to the extent that Dft sought to recoup the costs of the exhibits from Emma Alsips deposition as set out. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 10/31/2016. (tot)
November 17, 2015 112 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendant, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, and against Plaintiff, Duane Alsip as Administrator and Personal Representative of the Estate of Emma Alsip. It is ORDERED that the Plaintiff's claims against Wal-Mart Stores East, LP are DISMISSED with prejudice. Costs are to be taxed against the Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 11/17/2015. copies to parties. (sdb)
November 16, 2015 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 67 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 11/16/2015. copies to parties. (sdb)
November 12, 2015 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Dft Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.'s 71 Motion in Exclude Expert Testimony of Russell Kendzior as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 11/12/2015. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alsip v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma Alsip
Represented By: Michael J. Crow(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: W. Pemble DeLashmet(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Aubrey Patrick Dungan(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Chad Marchand(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?