White v. McLain et al

Plaintiff: Vincent White
Defendant: John McLain, Johnny Thornton, Sr., John Cassidy, Greg O'Shea, Allen O'Shea, Jeffery Sullivan and Clinton Law
Case Number: 1:2014cv00502
Filed: October 28, 2014
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2016 65 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Allen O'Shea, Clinton Law, Greg O'Shea, Jeffery Sullivan, John Cassidy, John McLain, Johnny Thornton, Sr against Vincent White as to Counts One and Three. Count Two is dismissed. Plaintiff's state law claims against all defendants (Counts Four and Five). Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/12/2016. (cmj)
April 28, 2016 61 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Allen O'Shea, Clinton Law, Greg O'Shea, Jeffery Sullivan, John Cassidy, John McLain, Johnny Thornton, Sr against Vincent White as to Counts One and Three. Count Two is dismissed. Plaintiff's state law claims against all defendants (Counts Four and Five). Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/28/2016. (cmj)
November 16, 2015 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion for Summary Judgment. Count I (unlawful entry, search, and seizure) is DENIED as to Defendant McLain and GRANTED as to all other Defendants. Count II (false arrest/false imprisonment) is DI SMISSED. Defendants motion for summary judgment as to Count III (excessive force) is GRANTED. Defendants motion for summary judgment as to Counts IV and V (state law claims of assault and outrage) is DENIED.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/16/2015. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. McLain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent White
Represented By: Henry Brewster
Represented By: John R. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McLain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Thornton, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg O'Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen O'Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinton Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?