Seacor Marine, LLC et al v. C&G Boat Works, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Seacor Marine, LLC and Liam J. McCall, LLC
Defendant: C&G Boat Works, Inc., Davenport Properties, LLC, Graham Gulf, Inc., Graham Holding Company, Inc., Graham Timber, LLC, JEG-SLG Marengo County Farm LLC and Janson Graham
Case Number: 1:2014cv00596
Filed: December 23, 2014
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Butler
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2016 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 149 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. All claims in this cause are DISMISSED W/PREJUDICE as set out. Each party shall bear his/its own costs. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 11/9/2016. (tot)
March 3, 2016 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Plfs' 86 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint as set out. The Clerk is directed to docket the First Amended Complaint attached as an exhibit to Doc. 86 . The parties are further directed to meet, confer & file a supplemental Rule 26(f) report within 14 days of today's date as required by Judge Cassady's 127 Order. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 3/3/2016. (tot)
September 29, 2015 123 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 120 Notice of Automatic Stay filed by C&G Boat Works, Inc. & 122 Notice of Automatic Stay filed by Graham Gulf, Inc. This action is STAYED as to C&G Boat Works, Inc., & Graham Gulf, Inc. Parties are to notify the court within 30 days of the resolution of the bankruptcy proceedings or of a lift of stay. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 9/29/2015. (tot)
June 24, 2015 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered STRIKING 73 Motion to Compel, as further set out in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 6/24/2015. (clr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seacor Marine, LLC et al v. C&G Boat Works, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seacor Marine, LLC
Represented By: Robert William Bledsoe
Represented By: Thomas Julian Butler
Represented By: Thomas S. Rue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liam J. McCall, LLC
Represented By: Robert William Bledsoe
Represented By: Thomas Julian Butler
Represented By: Thomas S. Rue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C&G Boat Works, Inc.
Represented By: D. Keith Andress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davenport Properties, LLC
Represented By: D. Keith Andress
Represented By: W. Austin Mulherin, III
Represented By: David Alan Strassburg, Jr.
Represented By: Michael E. Upchurch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graham Gulf, Inc.
Represented By: D. Keith Andress
Represented By: W. Austin Mulherin, III
Represented By: David Alan Strassburg, Jr.
Represented By: Michael E. Upchurch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graham Holding Company, Inc.
Represented By: D. Keith Andress
Represented By: W. Austin Mulherin, III
Represented By: David Alan Strassburg, Jr.
Represented By: Michael E. Upchurch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graham Timber, LLC
Represented By: D. Keith Andress
Represented By: W. Austin Mulherin, III
Represented By: David Alan Strassburg, Jr.
Represented By: Michael E. Upchurch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEG-SLG Marengo County Farm LLC
Represented By: D. Keith Andress
Represented By: W. Austin Mulherin, III
Represented By: David Alan Strassburg, Jr.
Represented By: Michael E. Upchurch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janson Graham
Represented By: D. Keith Andress
Represented By: W. Austin Mulherin, III
Represented By: David Alan Strassburg, Jr.
Represented By: Michael E. Upchurch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?