Lawson v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Plaintiff: Teresa Lawson
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 1:2015cv00026
Filed: January 20, 2015
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Presiding Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 2, 2015 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 57 Motion to Amend Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 11/2/2015. (srr)
May 15, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 7 Motion to Dismiss; plaintiff is GRANTED leave to re-file an amended complaint ONLY for the purpose of making allegations sufficient to state a claim or claims for bad faith by 5/22/15. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 5/15/2015. (srr)
March 31, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 12 Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 3/30/2015. (srr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawson v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Lawson
Represented By: S. Russ Copeland(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: James B. Newman(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?