SE Property Holdings, LLC v. Center et al

Plaintiff: SE Property Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Tammy T. Center, Estate of Charles H. Trammell, Belinda R. Trammell, Amy T. Brown, Trammell Family Orange Beach Properties, LLC and Trammell Family Lake Martin Properties, LLC
Case Number: 1:2015cv00033
Filed: January 23, 2015
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Presiding Judge: William E. Cassady
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 19, 2017 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 119 Motion in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness, Stacy Cummings. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/19/2017. (srd)
December 30, 2016 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 102 Motion to Continue; denying 107 Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/30/2016. (tgw)
April 6, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 49 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by SE Property Holdings, LLC. Amended Complaint due by 4/11/2016. Answer due from Defendants by 4/25/2016. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 4/6/2016. (tgw)
September 25, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 22 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Mobile County Circuit Court Action. This action is referred to Magistrate Judge Cassady for issuance of a Preliminary Scheduling Order and entry of a Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/25/2015. (tgw)
July 21, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 14 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants are ORDERED to file answers to the Complaint on or before August 4, 2015. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 7/21/2015. copies to parties. (sdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SE Property Holdings, LLC v. Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SE Property Holdings, LLC
Represented By: P. Russel Myles
Represented By: J. Blair Newman, Jr.(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy T. Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Charles H. Trammell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belinda R. Trammell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy T. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trammell Family Orange Beach Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trammell Family Lake Martin Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?